IL SB0203 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Company-Specific Subsidy Interstate Compact. Enters into the compact, which may be entered into by any state and the District of Columbia, in which each member state agrees to not offer company-specific subsidies for companies currently located in or considering locating in the member state, including, but not limited to, for corporate headquarters, manufacturing facilities, office space, or other real estate developments. Excludes existing company-specific subsidies (until terms change, are renewed, or are reenacted) and workforce from abolition under the compact. Creates the Interstate Company-Specific Subsidy Board upon the second member state entering into the compact. Provides for withdrawal of a member state with 6-months' written notice. Defines terms.
Title
COMPANY-SPECIFIC SUBSIDIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=203&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0203.htm |