IL SB0209 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to special education joint agreements, provides that under no circumstances may a petition for withdrawal from a joint agreement be presented to other member districts less than 18 months from the date of the proposed withdrawal. Provides that if a petition for withdrawal is not approved by the other member districts, any petitioning member district (rather than only a petitioning member district that is part of a Class II county school unit outside of a city of 500,000 or more inhabitants) may appeal the disapproval. Provides that the trustees of schools of the township having jurisdiction and authority over the withdrawing district or the hearing panel established by the chief administrative officer of the intermediate service center having jurisdiction over the withdrawing district shall convene and hear testimony to determine whether the withdrawing district has presented sufficient evidence that the district, standing alone, will provide a full continuum of services and support to all its students with disabilities in the foreseeable future; specifies requirements for the withdrawing district prior to the hearing. Provides that each withdrawing district shall develop a comprehensive plan that includes the administrative policies and procedures outlined in specified special education rules of the State Board of Education and all relevant portions of the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act. Provides that the withdrawing district must also demonstrate its ability to provide education for a wide range of students with disabilities, including a full continuum of support and services. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0164 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |