IL SB0217 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the salary of any employee of a school board who is a member of any reserve component of the United States Armed Services and is mobilized to active military duty or teacher who is employed in a Department of Defense overseas dependents' school or is mobilized to active military duty, removes a provision decreasing the amount of the employee's salary by the employee's base pay for military service.
Title
SCH CD-MILITARY SERVICE-SALARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.7b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-15a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=217&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0217.htm |