IL SB0219 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a period of probation, a term of periodic imprisonment or conditional discharge shall not be imposed for a violation of child pornography if the child is a household or family member of the defendant. Provides that the court shall sentence the offender to not less than the minimum term of imprisonment for this offense, and may order a fine or restitution or both in conjunction with the term of imprisonment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-CHILD PORNOGRAPHY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback