IL SB0239 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission in its annual submission of recommendation to the Governor and General Assembly shall include recommendations regarding the inclusion of emerging adults into a developmentally appropriate justice system, reducing recidivism, and preventing deeper criminal involvement. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides in the Article concerning delinquent minors that on and after January 1, 2020, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 19th birthday has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law, or county or municipal ordinance and the law or ordinance is classified as a misdemeanor offense. Provides that on and after January 1, 2022, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 21st birthday has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law or county or municipal ordinance and the law or ordinance is classified as a misdemeanor offense. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to violations or attempted violations committed on or after the effective of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV COURT-DELINQUENT MINOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050517a-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback