IL SB0241 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act. Provides that it is unlawful for a manufacturer to import for profit, sell, or offer for sale in this State any cosmetic, if the cosmetic was developed or manufactured using an animal test that was conducted or contracted by the manufacturer, or any supplier of the manufacturer, on or after January 1, 2020. Provides exceptions to the prohibition. Provides that a violation of the Act shall be punishable by an initial fine of $5,000 for the first day of each violation and an additional fine of $1,000 for each day the violation continues. Provides that a violation may be enforced by the State's Attorney of the county in which the violation occurred or by the municipal attorney of the municipality in which the violation occurred. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COSMETICS-ANIMAL TESTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2019-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture
2019-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-025-001
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-01HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-01HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-21HouseArrived in House
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2019
2019-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-07SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Agriculture
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41062017.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=241&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0241.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0241eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0241enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0241sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0241sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0241ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0241_03212019_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0241_05212019_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0241ham001_05302019_029000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback