IL SB0250 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the SAFE Act. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020, funding formulas based on population shall include prisoners as residents based on the place where they resided before incarceration or the place they intend to return. Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Provides that within 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall identify geographic areas eligible to be designated by the Safe and Full Coordinating Board as a Safe and Full Employment Zone (SAFE Zone) and shall send to the Legislative Audit Commission and make publicly available its analysis and development of the SAFE Zones. Provides that the criteria for these SAFE Zones shall be used to prioritize State funding and provide various services throughout the State. Creates the Safe and Full Employment Coordinating Board to develop and implement a plan for designating SAFE Zones. Provides that the design of programs and budget requirements in SAFE Zones shall be developed by Local Economic Growth Councils. Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides that for purposes of the amount of funds allocable to each municipality and county in the State, the number of individual residents of a municipality or county shall include the number of persons incarcerated in a penal institution who resided in the municipality or county before incarceration, or, if known, the municipality or county the prisoner intends to return after release from the penal institution. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the First Time Weapon Offender Program shall be implemented by the Safe and Full Employment Coordinating Board. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SAFE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3930 | 7.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3930 | 7.3-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3930 | 7.3-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=250&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0250.htm |