IL SB0262 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various appropriations and reappropriations for specified purposes. Amends Public Act 100-586 by changing and adding various appropriations and reappropriations. Provides that specified appropriations may be used for prior year costs. Provides that specified appropriations shall be used for all costs incurred before July 1, 2019. Some provisions are effective immediately; Some provisions are effective July 1, 2019; also contains other effective date provisions.
Title
$GOMB
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0007 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2019; Some provisions; if an amendment to specified provisions of Public Act 100-586 becomes law. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Effective Date June 5, 2019; Some provisions |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-019-000 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-035-000 |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2019-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-004 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations II; 010-000-005 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations II |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |