IL SB0397 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Court Reporters Act. Deletes language providing specific factors to consider when determining how many court reporters are needed in each circuit. Provides that the employer representative may authorize the chief judge of any circuit to appoint administrative, supervisory, and clerical staff when a need for such positions has been substantiated (rather than to appoint or designate a court reporter to a specific position). Provides that additional amounts paid to personnel shall be determined by the employer representative. Deletes language providing that additional amounts paid to personnel shall not exceed certain amounts. Provides that the audio or video recording system utilized by the court shall be approved by the Supreme Court. Deletes language providing that a court reporter shall not be in charge of an audio or video recording system where the system is the judge's personal property or has been supplied by a party or a party's attorney. Provides that a court reporting services employee may charge a page rate for the preparation of transcripts of court proceedings not to exceed the rate set by the employer representative (rather than not to exceed 25 cents per 100 words). Deletes language providing that the transcripts shall be filed and remain with the papers of the case. Provides that expense vouchers or claims submitted to the Office of the Comptroller for payment shall have the signed approval of the chief judge of the circuit court in which the court reporter is appointed (rather the chief judge of the circuit court in which the court reporter incurred the expense for which claim is made). Provides that each court reporter shall take a test to verify (rather than rate) his or her proficiency within one year of employment. Provides that the test shall be prepared and administered pursuant to standards set by rules. Provides that a proficiency test passed prior to employment may be accepted as proof of proficiency. Deletes language providing that the test shall consist of 3 parts and be administered at least every 6 months. Deletes language providing specific amounts for a court reporter's salary. Deletes language providing for credited court reporter proficiency ratings. Deletes language requiring an annual appropriation request to be made in January. Provides that the employer representatives (rather than the Supreme Court) shall collectively bargain over wages, hours, and terms and conditions of employment of all persons employed as court reporters, appoint arbitrators under specified circumstances, and create a roster of arbitrators who are available and qualified for appointment.
Title
COURT REPORTERS ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Nathan Reitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0581 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |