IL SB0416 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a defendant being found guilty of an administrative infraction related to an act or acts of public indecency or sexual misconduct in a penal institution shall be considered a factor in aggravation in sentencing.
Title
COUNTY JAIL GOOD BEHAVIOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0401 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |