IL SB0446 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |