IL SB0447 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Family Practice Residency Act. Changes the title of the Act to the Underserved Physician Workforce Act. Provides that the Act applies to primary care physicians, general surgeons, emergency medicine physicians, or obstetricians (rather than primary care physicians and other eligible primary care providers). Defines "primary care physician". Makes conforming and other changes, including amending the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, Nurses in Advancement Law, Private Medical Scholarship Agreement Act, and Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective immediately.
Title
PHYSICIAN-GRANTS-UNDERSERVED
Sponsors
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0118 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Effective Date July 22, 2019 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Crowe |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |