IL SB0449 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a financial oversight panel's powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PARENT-VICTIM-SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-07HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-017-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-003-000
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-03-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-18SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551B-22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback