IL SB0458 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
SCH CD-DATA-SPECIAL EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-01-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-01-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-005-000 |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |