IL SB0459 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Mental Health Committee; Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-28HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee;
2019-05-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-27HouseArrived in House
2019-05-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Ellman
2019-05-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-14SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-13SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11559Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback