IL SB0460 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Delays until July 1, 2020 the requirement that, no later than 3 school days prior to a child's individualized education program eligibility meeting or meeting to review a child's individualized education program, or as soon as possible if an individualized education program meeting is scheduled within 3 school days with the written consent of the child's parent or guardian, the local education agency must provide the child's parent or guardian with copies of all written material that will be considered by the individualized education program team at the meeting so that the parent or guardian may participate in the meeting as a fully-informed team member. Provides that a school district may (rather than must) utilize response to scientific, research-based intervention or multi-tiered systems of support as part of an evaluation procedure to determine if a child is eligible for special education services due to a specific learning disability. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL-IEP-MATERIAL/EVALUATION
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0598 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Effective Date December 6, 2019 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-11-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-11-13 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-11-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-10-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |