IL SB0529 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Government Severance Pay Act. Provides that the Act shall not apply to contracts or employment agreements for individuals employed by the department of intercollegiate athletics of a college or university when the employee's compensation is funded by non-State-appropriated funds, such as revenues generated by athletic events or activities, gifts or donations, or any combination thereof. Provides that nothing in the provisions entitles an individual employed by the department of intercollegiate athletics of a college or university to receive severance pay when that individual has been dismissed for misconduct. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT SEVERANCE-ATHLETICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0195 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-001 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-002-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-003-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-001-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |