IL SB0531 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Bridge Act. Provides that the county board may enter into an agreement establishing a toll rate schedule for a period not to exceed 99 years. Provides that the amendatory Act is declarative of existing law and shall be given retroactive effect. Effective immediately.
Title
TOLL BRIDGE-TOLL RATE SCHEDULE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-23 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0644 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Effective Date June 26, 2020 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2020-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 23, 2020 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2020-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2020-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-023-000 |
2020-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-05-21 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2020-05-21 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-21 | House | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-01-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |