IL SB0552 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIM PRO-ABOLISH MONETARY BAIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Trotter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-001-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 002-001-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Bail Reform |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |