IL SB0556 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equitable Restrooms Act. Provides that every single-occupancy restroom in a place of public accommodation or public building shall be identified as all-gender and designated for use by no more than one person at a time or for family or assisted use. Provides that "place of public accommodation" has the meaning provided in the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that each single-occupancy restroom shall be outfitted with exterior signage indicating "all-gender" or "gender-neutral". Provides that these provisions apply to any existing or future places of public accommodation or public buildings. Provides that during an inspection of a place of public accommodation or public building by a health officer or health inspector, the health officer or health inspector may inspect the place of accommodation or public building to determine whether it complies. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
EQUITABLE RESTROOMS-ALL-GENDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0165 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-005-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-14 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 1-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |