IL SB0650 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Telecommunications Article.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Insurance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Insurance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |