IL SB0651 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Requires the Auditor General to conduct a financial audit, a compliance audit, or other attestation engagement, as is appropriate to the agency's operations under generally accepted government auditing standards, of the Chicago school district at least once during every biennium. Amends the School Code. Requires the board of education of the Chicago school district to cooperate fully with the Auditor General and to be subject to any compliance requirements as required of any other State agency during the biennial audit. Effective immediately.
Title
CHICAGO SCH-BIENNIAL AUDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-18.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 5 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=651&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0651.htm |