IL SB0652 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Gas Pipeline Safety Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 20 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |