IL SB0653 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electric Supplier Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0119
2019-07-22SenateEffective Date July 22, 2019
2019-07-22SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-038-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-05-27HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-003-000
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-16HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-05-15HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=653&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0653.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0653eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0653enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0119.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0653sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0653sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0653ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0653_04112019_057000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0653_05272019_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0653ham001_05312019_027000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback