IL SB0657 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in the Section concerning the short title of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STRUCTURAL ENGINEERING-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-05-27HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056351-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=657&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0657ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0657_04112019_059000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0657_05272019_022000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0657ham003_05312019_080002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0657ham002_05312019_080001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0657ham001_05312019_080000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback