IL SB0664 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-18)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-18)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Tobacco Products Compliance Act. Provides that any person who manufactures, fabricates, assembles, processes, or labels a tobacco product or imports a finished tobacco product for sale or distribution in the United States, located in or having a place of business in the State, shall provide written certification of its compliance with labeling provisions of the federal Family Smoking Prevention and Tobacco Control Act of 2009 to the Department of Public Health. Provides for enforcement and rulemaking by the Department of Public Health. Effective immediately.
Title
TOBACCO PRODUCTS COMPLIANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0582 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2019 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-024-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 42 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |