IL SB0665 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the ID/DD Community Care Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
2019-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-003-000
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210471-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback