IL SB0685 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a county with fewer than 3,000,000 inhabitants, provides for the permissive waiver of interest and penalties. Provides that, in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants, the annual tax sale that would ordinarily be held in calendar year 2020 shall be held no earlier than (i) 120 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act or (2) until the first day of the first month during which there is no longer a statewide COVID-19 public health emergency, as evidenced by an effective disaster declaration of the Governor covering all counties in the State. In provisions concerning the homestead exemption for persons with disabilities, the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, and the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption, provides that those exemptions may be granted without application for the 2020 taxable year if the property qualified for the exemption in the 2019 taxable year, subject to certain limitations related to the COVID-19 pandemic. Provides that under no circumstance may a tax year be offered at a scavenger sale prior to the annual tax sale for that tax year. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-COVID-19-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0635 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Effective Date June 5, 2020 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 1 - May 22, 2020 |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2020-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2020-05-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-05-21 | House | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-20 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2020-05-20 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris; ; was filed before 3 pm |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 16 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |