IL SB0690 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTELL-QUALIFIED SCHOOL DIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0031
2019-06-28SenateEffective Date June 28, 2019; ; some provisions take effect 1-1-20
2019-06-28SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-05SenateSent to the Governor
2019-06-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-06-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-06-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-06-02SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-06-02SenateSenate Concurs
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 046-010-002
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 046-010-002
2019-06-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-010-002
2019-06-02Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-06-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-06-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-06-02SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2019-06-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-06-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2019-06-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - June 2, 2019
2019-06-02SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2019-06-01HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-027-000
2019-06-01House3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Suspend Rule 15(d) - Prevailed
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 (M1) Moved to Suspend Rule 15(d)-Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2019-06-01HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-31SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-31SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-005-000
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-01HouseArrived in House
2019-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-018-000
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2019-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-01SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-005-000
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2019
2019-04-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-25SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=690&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0031.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0690ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0690_05012019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0690_06012019_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0690ham003_06022019_003002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0690ham002_06022019_003001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0690ham001_06022019_003000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback