IL SB0727 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes: (1) removes a provision defining "Eskimos or other aboriginal people of Alaska"; (2) modifies the definition of "Native American" to have the same meaning as "American Indian or Alaska Native" as provided under the Illinois Human Rights Act; and (3) removes a provision concerning State agency affirmative action and equal employment goals. Makes conforming changes.
Title
NATIVE AMERICAN EMPLOY PLAN
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0534 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |