IL SB0728 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the DUI Prevention and Education Commission Act. Creates the DUI Prevention and Education Commission, and provides for the membership of the Commission. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall provide administrative support to the Commission. Provides for the meetings and powers of the Commission. Creates the DUI Prevention and Education Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides for the use of moneys in the DUI Prevention and Education Fund. Provides that the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer any remaining balance in excess of $30,000 from the Roadside Memorial Fund to the DUI Prevention and Education Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the DUI Prevention and Education Fund.
Title
DUI PREVENTION AND EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0196 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 55 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |