IL SB0731 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Act. Provides that the terms of the mutual cooperation between the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum ("Agency") and the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Foundation ("Foundation") shall be set forth in a memorandum of understanding. Provides that the memorandum of understanding will include, at a minimum: (a) authorization for the Foundation to operate food service, catering service, and retail activities at the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum with the net proceeds being made available to the Agency; (b) disclosure by the Foundation of specified financial information and tax returns to the Agency; and (c) creation of a working group composed of 3 members of the Agency Board and 3 members of the Foundation Board, together with the State Historian. Provides that the working group shall collaborate to advance the interests of the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum and shall develop an official mission statement for the Library and Museum to align and guide the efforts of both the Agency and the Foundation. Provides that the State Historian shall serve as chair. Effective immediately.
Title
LINCOLN PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0535 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |