IL SB0765 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that a board of trustees may (i) appoint a non-resident or a resident that has not resided in the district for one year to be a highway commissioner, or (ii) contract with a neighboring township to provide highway commissioner services if: (1) the district is within a township with no incorporated town; (2) the township is a population of less than 500; and (3) no qualified candidate who has resided in the township for at least one year is willing to serve as highway commissioner.
Title
HIGHWAY CODE-COMMISSIONER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0197 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |