IL SB0903 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that any person incarcerated on a bailable offense who does not supply bail and against whom a fine is levied on conviction of such offense shall be allowed a credit of $30 (rather than $5) for each day so incarcerated upon application of the defendant.
Title
CRIM PRO-INCARCERATION CREDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |