IL SB0947 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall include, in each registration renewal notice, information advising drivers of how to properly approach a stationary authorized emergency vehicle. Provides that the Secretary shall include, in the question pool used for the written portion of the driver's license examination, test questions concerning safe driving when approaching authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
VEH CD-APPROACH EMERGENCY VEH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |