IL SB1041 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in a county with more than 800,000 inhabitants but fewer than 1,000,000 inhabitants, if a lessee is liable for the payment of property taxes extended against property that is owned by a taxing district, the county treasurer shall promptly notify the taxing district that owns the property if the property taxes are delinquent 60 days after the second installment due date. Provides that the taxing district shall promptly notify the county supervisor of assessments upon the execution of a new lease or the termination of a lease. Provides that the State's Attorney of the county in which the property is located may bring an action against the lessee in the circuit court to recover the full amount of delinquent taxes, interest, penalties, and costs.
Title
PROP TX-LESSEE-LIABLE-PAYMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0198 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-004-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; DeWitte |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeWitte |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 620 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |