IL SB1042 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on January 1, 1996 by the City of Savanna. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-CITY OF SAVANNA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0618 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date December 20, 2019 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-001-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 007-001-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 12, 2019 |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-10-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-007-001 |
2019-10-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-10-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 615 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |