IL SB1043 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxing district's aggregate extension base shall be adjusted whenever an assessment increase or decrease due to the issuance of a certificate of error, a decision of the board of review, or a decision of the Property Tax Appeal Board results in the overextension or underextension of taxes for the last preceding levy year. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-AGGREGATE EXTENSION BASE
Sponsors
Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-22 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-10-22 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Don DeWitte |
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeWitte |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |