IL SB1055 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning water treatment facilities, removes provisions concerning certification by the Department of Natural Resources. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2020, qualified water treatment facilities shall apply for assessment to and be assessed by the Department of Revenue. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-WATER TREAT FACILITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0199 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |