IL SB1108 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Moves the investment power for eligible downstate police and downstate firefighter pension funds that have net assets in trust that exceed an amount equal to 3 months of current liabilities to the Board of Trustees of the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF). Provides that within 24 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Insurance shall audit the investment assets of each eligible pension fund to determine a certified investment asset list. Provides that upon receipt of the certified investment asset list, the Board of IMRF shall initiate the transfer of assets from the board of trustees of the eligible pension fund to the Board of IMRF. Makes conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
PEN CD-POLICE/FIRE INVESTMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-101.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-101.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-135.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-135.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-128.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-128.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 7-226 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 7-227 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1108&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1108.htm |