IL SB1112 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles, provides that the annual employer contribution shall include an amount sufficient to bring the total assets of the pension fund up to 80% (instead of 90%) of the total actuarial liabilities of the pension fund by the end of municipal fiscal year 2050 (instead of 2040). Makes a conforming change. In the General Provisions Article, requires the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability to conduct a study on the costs and benefits of consolidating all downstate police and downstate firefighter pension funds into a single pension fund and to submit its report on its findings to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-DWNST POL&FIRE-FINANCING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-165.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1112&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1112.htm |