IL SB1116 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a minor is subject to the Act if the court has made a finding of probable cause to believe that the minor is abused, neglected, or dependent under the Act prior to the minor's 18th birthday (rather than any minor under 18 years of age). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-APPLICABILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0079
2019-07-12SenateEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-10SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
2019-03-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
2019-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-23Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback