IL SB1127 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Provides that the Division of Aeronautics of the Department of Transportation shall require the display of an MIA flag at any airport in its jurisdiction, either upon the same flag-staff as the United States national flag or otherwise. Effective immediately.
Title
AIRPORT REGULATION MIA FLAG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0538 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Veterans Affairs |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
620 | 5 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |