IL SB1132 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, the Cigarette Use Tax Act, the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, and the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the vendor discount amount under those Acts shall be 1.75%. Provides that the vendor discount may not exceed $1,000 per vendor in any calendar year. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VENDOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1132&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1132.htm |