IL SB1136 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that each State agency shall designate one or more persons with hiring responsibilities to annually attend a presentation provided by the Department of Central Management Services regarding programs created by the Department that were developed and implemented to increase the number of qualified employees with disabilities working in the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMS PROGRAMS-AGENCY ATTENDANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-001
2019-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2019-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2019-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019
2019-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-21HouseArrived in House
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-122Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback