IL SB1149 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that a person is not eligible to be elected or serve as library trustee: unless he or she is a qualified elector of the local jurisdiction and has resided in it for at least one year at the time he or she files nomination papers or a declaration of intent to become a write-in candidate or is presented for appointment; or who, at the time of his or her appointment or filing of nomination papers or a declaration of intent to become a write-in candidate, is in arrears in the payment of property tax due to the library or has been convicted in any court in the United States of any infamous crime, bribery, perjury, or other felony. Amends the Public Library District Act of 1991 making conforming changes to the wording of the trustee eligibility requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARY TRUSTEES-ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 30-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 5 | 4-3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |