IL SB1165 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Behavioral Health Workforce Education Center Task Force Act. Provides that the Behavioral Health Education Center Task Force must recognize that the behavioral health workforce is comprised of a broad range of professions providing prevention, treatment, and rehabilitation services for mental health conditions and substance use disorders. Provides that to address workforce capacity issues that impact access to care, the Task Force must engage in extensive planning and data collection. Provides that because there is no central data repository that exists for Illinois' behavioral health workforce, the Task Force must identify a data set, which is a foundational step to analyzing and providing recommendations to the concepts presented in House Bill 5111, as introduced, of the 100th General Assembly. Requires the Task Force to submit its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019 (rather than on or before September 28, 2018). Effective immediately.
Title
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0202 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 165 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |