IL SB1167 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish and administer an adult vocational community college scholarship program. Provides that beginning with the 2020-2021 academic year, the Commission shall, each year, receive and consider applications for scholarships to community colleges for people over the age of 30 who have been unemployed and are actively searching for employment and who can identify the specific training certificate, credential, or associate degree that he or she is seeking to obtain. Allows applicants to re-apply for the scholarship if they can demonstrate continual progress toward the desired certificate, credential, or degree. Provides that scholarships shall not exceed $2,000 per recipient per academic year. Allows the Commission to establish appropriate applications and forms. Requires the Commission to adopt all necessary and proper rules to implement the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMM COLL-VOCATION SCHOLARSHIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-007-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
2019-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Ellman
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094765.105New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback