IL SB1184 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board or board of county commissioners of a county may prohibit the sale of and the use of coal tar sealant product and high polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbon sealant product on any surface, except for highway structures, including, but not limited to, a driveway, parking area, playground, sidewalk, bike trail, or roadway within the county. Amends the Municipal Code making similar changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY&MUNI-COAL TAR PRODUCTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-1061.5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-30-8Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-80-24New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback