IL SB1190 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller may make sales and deliveries of up to 2,500 gallons of spirits to retail licensees per year. Provides that the aggregate amount of spirits sold to non-licensees and sold or delivered to retail licensees may not exceed 2,500 gallons. Provides that a craft distiller or a non-resident dealer who manufactures less than 100,000 gallons of distilled spirits per year may make application to the Illinois Liquor Control Commission for a self-distribution exemption. Provides requirements that a craft distiller or non-resident dealer who manufactures less than 100,000 gallons of distilled spirits per year must meet to be granted a self-distribution exemption. Provides that if any provision of the Act, or its application to any person or circumstance, is determined by a court of competent jurisdiction to be unconstitutional, the remaining provisions shall be construed in accordance with the intent of the General Assembly to further limit rather than expand commerce in alcoholic liquor. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-09-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 11-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1190&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1190.htm |